ND HB1464 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 14 of section 54-44.3-20, section 54-57-01, subsection 1 of section 54-57-03, sections 65-01-16, 65-02-01, 65-02-03.3, 65-02-22, 65-02-33, 65-04-19.3, and 65-04-32, subdivision b of subsection 3 of section 65-05-29, and subsection 2 of section 65-05.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workforce safety and insurance board, workforce safety and insurance administrative hearings, and workforce safety and insurance personnel; to repeal sections 65-02-01.2 and 65-02-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workforce safety and insurance personnel system and spending authority; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 14 of section 54-44.3-20, section 54-57-01, subsection 1 of section 54-57-03, sections 65-01-16, 65-02-01, 65-02-03.3, 65-02-22, 65-02-33, 65-04-19.3, and 65-04-32, subdivision b of subsection 3 of section 65-05-29, and subsection 2 of section 65-05.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workforce safety and insurance board, workforce safety and insurance administrative hearings, and workforce safety and insurance personnel; to repeal sections 65-02-01.2 and 65-02-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workforce safety and insurance personnel system and spending authority; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Berg [R] | Rep. Tracy Boe [D] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to House | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading passed, y 046 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-24 | Request return from committee | |
2009-03-23 | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-03-19 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading passed, y 092 n 002 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1464.html |