ND HB1452 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Schneider A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 16.1-13-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the call for a special election to fill a vacancy in the United States House of Representatives due to a catastrophic circumstance.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Schneider A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 16.1-13-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the call for a special election to fill a vacancy in the United States House of Representatives due to a catastrophic circumstance.
Sponsors
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-09 | Returned to House | |
2009-04-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-02 | Received from House | |
2009-01-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 083 nays 003 | |
2009-01-26 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1452.html |