ND HB1451 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Erbele A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a ban on open burning; to amend and reenact section 37-17.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a ban on open burning; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Erbele A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a ban on open burning; to amend and reenact section 37-17.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a ban on open burning; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 057 nays 036 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 001 | |
2009-02-13 | Committee Hearing 08:15 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1451.html |