ND HB1448 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Nodland, Triplett A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 9 of section 57-38-01.29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the homestead income tax credit for agricultural or commercial property; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Nodland, Triplett A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 9 of section 57-38-01.29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the homestead income tax credit for agricultural or commercial property; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 000 | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-03-09 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 041 nays 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-09 | Received from House | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 002 | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1448.html |