ND HB1416 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 61-21-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of cleaning out and repairing of drain.
Title
The definition of cleaning out and repairing of drain.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 8 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 82 |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-08 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |