ND HB1411 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection? 2 of section 16.1-08.1-02, subsection? 1 of section 16.1-08-03, section? 16.1-08.1-03.1, subsection? 2 of section? 16.1-08.1-03.3, subsection? 2 of section? 16.1-08.1-03.5, subsection? 2 of section? 16.1-08.1-03.8, subsection? 1 of section? 16.1-08.1-03.9, subsection? 2 of section? 16.1-08.1-03.12, subsection? 6 of section? 16.1-08.1-03.13, and section? 16.1-08.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to political contribution statements.
Title
Political contribution statements.
Sponsors
Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74 |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |