ND HB1382 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-06-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assessment of oil or gas pipeline property; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 57-06-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assessment of oil or gas pipeline property; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1382.html |