ND HB1299 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 007 nays 039
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 007 nays 039
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-24.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for medical assistance.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-24.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for medical assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 007 nays 039 | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1299.html |