ND HB1278 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 61-24.5-04, 61-24.5-07, and 61-24.5-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to members of the board of directors of the southwest water authority.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 61-24.5-04, 61-24.5-07, and 61-24.5-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to members of the board of directors of the southwest water authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 068 nays 024 | |
2009-04-13 | Concurred | |
2009-04-03 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-03 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-04-01 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 074 nays 020 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 003 | |
2009-02-06 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-16 | Rereferred to Natural Resources | |
2009-01-16 | Request return from committee | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1278.html |