ND HB1263 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. J. Lee A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duties of assisted living facilities; and to provide for a legislative council study.
Title
Introduced by Sen. J. Lee A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duties of assisted living facilities; and to provide for a legislative council study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 080 nays 012 | |
2009-04-13 | Concurred | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 084 nays 003 | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1263.html |