ND HB1227 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 001 nays 092
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 001 nays 092
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Hogue A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an apprentice hunter program; and to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an online internet hunter safety education program.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Hogue A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an apprentice hunter program; and to amend and reenact section 20.1-03-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an online internet hunter safety education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 001 nays 092 | |
2009-04-23 | Concurred | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-19 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Request return from committee | |
2009-03-18 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-02-06 | Received from House | |
2009-02-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 074 nays 020 | |
2009-02-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-30 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 003 | |
2009-01-27 | Rereferred to Natural Resources | |
2009-01-26 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 003 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 07:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1227.html |