ND HB1220 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Stenehjem A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 44-04-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a meeting.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Stenehjem A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 44-04-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a meeting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-13 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-03-09 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 087 nays 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1220.html |