ND HB1213 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 14-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the uniform disposition of community property rights at death act.
Title
The uniform disposition of community property rights at death act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 29 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 61 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 3 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |