ND HB1207 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Warner A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 6-08.1-02 and a new section to chapter 27-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exemption to bank confidentiality requirements for attorney trust account overdrafts and to the conduct of attorneys.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist, Warner A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 6-08.1-02 and a new section to chapter 27-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exemption to bank confidentiality requirements for attorney trust account overdrafts and to the conduct of attorneys.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-15 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-15 | Conference committee dissolved | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Nething Lyson Fiebiger | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-04-10 | Concurred | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Received from House | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1207.html |