ND HB1188 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Lyson A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exploitation of wildlife; to amend and reenact section 20.1-01-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to suspension of hunting, trapping, or fishing privileges; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Hogue, Lyson A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exploitation of wildlife; to amend and reenact section 20.1-01-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to suspension of hunting, trapping, or fishing privileges; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-24 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 039 nays 007 | |
2009-04-24 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 002 | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Triplett Hogue Schneider | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Porter Damschen Hanson | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-06 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources | |
2009-01-30 | Received from House | |
2009-01-29 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 002 | |
2009-01-23 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1188.html |