ND HB1157 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 57-15-19.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to township excess levies for emergency purposes; and to amend and reenact section 57-15-20.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exceptions to tax levy limitations in townships; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Exceptions to tax levy limitations in townships; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-15 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 16 |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |