ND HB1133 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 39-04-17 and 39-05-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to certificates of notary showing registration requirements and transfer of title of a vehicle.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 39-04-17 and 39-05-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to certificates of notary showing registration requirements and transfer of title of a vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-05 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-03 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-02 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-01-20 | Received from House | |
2009-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 081 nays 011 | |
2009-01-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1133.html |