ND HB1132 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06-03, subsection 3 of section 39-06-19, subsection 1 of section 39-06.2-09, subsection 17 of section 39-06.2-10, section 39-20-03.1, subsection 2 of section 39-20-03.2, and subsection 1 of section 39-20-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to who may be licensed, distinguishing numbers on operator's licenses, content of commercial driver's licenses, disqualification and cancellation of commercial driver's licenses, action following test results of a resident operator, action following test result or refusal of a nonresident operator, and action following test results; and to repeal section 39-16-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to seizure or return of an operator's license.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06-03, subsection 3 of section 39-06-19, subsection 1 of section 39-06.2-09, subsection 17 of section 39-06.2-10, section 39-20-03.1, subsection 2 of section 39-20-03.2, and subsection 1 of section 39-20-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to who may be licensed, distinguishing numbers on operator's licenses, content of commercial driver's licenses, disqualification and cancellation of commercial driver's licenses, action following test results of a resident operator, action following test result or refusal of a nonresident operator, and action following test results; and to repeal section 39-16-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to seizure or return of an operator's license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-13 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-01-13 | Received from House | |
2009-01-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-01-09 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1132.html |