ND HB1111 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subsections to section 4-30-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dairy product definitions; and to amend and reenact sections 4-30-18, 4-30-20, 4-30-36, 4-30-36.2, 4-30-36.3, 4-30-36.4, 4-30-39, and 4-30-45.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dairy products regulations.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subsections to section 4-30-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dairy product definitions; and to amend and reenact sections 4-30-18, 4-30-20, 4-30-36, 4-30-36.2, 4-30-36.3, 4-30-36.4, 4-30-39, and 4-30-45.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dairy products regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-05 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 11:15 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1111.html |