ND HB1109 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to meetings of commodity groups; and to amend and reenact sections 4-10.1-04, 4-10.2-03, 4-10.3-03, 4-10.4-03, 4-10.5-02, 4-10.7-02, and 4-27-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, or in the alternative to amend and reenact sections 4.1-02-01, 4.1-02-03, 4.1-02-09, 4.1-06-03, 4.1-07-01, 4.1-07-03, 4.1-07-08, 4.1-09-01, 4.1-09-04, 4.1-09-12, 4.1-10-03, 4.1-10-05, 4.1-10-06, 4.1-11-01, 4.1-11-03, and 4.1-11-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to removal of the agriculture commissioner from governing bodies of commodity groups.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to meetings of commodity groups; and to amend and reenact sections 4-10.1-04, 4-10.2-03, 4-10.3-03, 4-10.4-03, 4-10.5-02, 4-10.7-02, and 4-27-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, or in the alternative to amend and reenact sections 4.1-02-01, 4.1-02-03, 4.1-02-09, 4.1-06-03, 4.1-07-01, 4.1-07-03, 4.1-07-08, 4.1-09-01, 4.1-09-04, 4.1-09-12, 4.1-10-03, 4.1-10-05, 4.1-10-06, 4.1-11-01, 4.1-11-03, and 4.1-11-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to removal of the agriculture commissioner from governing bodies of commodity groups.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-23 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-13 | Committee Hearing 08:13 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-01-26 | Received from House | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 089 nays 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1109.html |