ND HB1086 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 61-01-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to waters of the state.
Title
Waters of the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91 |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-08 | House | Rereferred to Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | House | Request return from committee |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |