ND HB1064 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 65-05-09, 65-05.2-01, and 65-05.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cost-of-living adjustments for workers' compensation total disability benefits; to provide for application; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 65-05-09, 65-05.2-01, and 65-05.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to cost-of-living adjustments for workers' compensation total disability benefits; to provide for application; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-10 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-09 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-05 | Request return from committee | |
2009-03-05 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading passed, y 094 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-01-28 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1064.html |