ND HB1061 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 65-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation definition of artificial members as it relates to compensable injuries; and to provide for application.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 65-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation definition of artificial members as it relates to compensable injuries; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-02-12 | Received from House | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1061.html |