NC S939 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Government
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Government
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Fayetteville Review Board
Title
Fayetteville Review Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Government | |
2012-06-26 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-06-25 | Postponed To 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-11 | Re-ref Com On Government | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-11 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-31 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-05-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-30 | Filed |