NC S9 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
No Discriminatory Purpose in Death Penalty
Title
No Discriminatory Purpose in Death Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-04 - Senate - Motion 11\VETO OVERRIDE (Y: 0 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-11-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Second Reading\M7 PP DAY/Susp\end Rules 2ND\AND 3RD (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 0 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - Second Reading\M7 PP DAY/Susp\end Rules 2ND\AND 3RD (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-14 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2012-05-24 | Placed On Cal For 5/29/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-01-04 | Ref To Com On Judiciary | |
2012-01-04 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-01-04 | Veto Overridden | |
2012-01-04 | Placed On Cal For 1/4/2012 | |
2011-12-14 | Vetoed 12/14/2011 | |
2011-11-29 | Pres. To Gov. 11/29/2011 | |
2011-11-28 | Ratified | |
2011-11-28 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-11-28 | Placed On Cal For 11/28/2011 | |
2011-11-28 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2011-07-28 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-07-28 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/28/2011 | |
2011-07-28 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-06-16 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Postponed To 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-02 | Postponed To 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-22 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-02-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-15 | Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-02-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-08 | Placed On Cal For 2/10/2011 | |
2011-02-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-01-31 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-01-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H12 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-240