NC S876 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Ch. SL 2012-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-02 - Ch. SL 2012-137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mooresville Deannexation
Title
Mooresville Deannexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | Ch. SL 2012-137 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-25 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-25 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-25 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-24 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |