NC S833 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Held by Senate
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Held by Senate
Summary
Delineate River Basins.
Title
Delineate River Basins.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Held by Senate | |
2009-04-28 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-27 | Returned To Senate | |
2009-04-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-27 | Recalled From House | |
2009-04-22 | Ref to the Com on Water Resources and Infrastructure, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources | |
2009-04-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-25 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2009-03-24 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S833 |