NC S714 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Ref To Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control
Pending: House Alcoholic Beverage Control Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Ref To Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control
Pending: House Alcoholic Beverage Control Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
ABC Regulation and Reform
Title
ABC Regulation and Reform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | House | Ref To Com On Alcoholic Beverage Control |
2018-06-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H944 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Serial Referral To Finance Added