NC S697 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Patient Advocacy & Protection Act
Title
Patient Advocacy & Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Health Care | |
2011-06-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |