NC S684 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirm Retirement System BOT
Title
Confirm Retirement System BOT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Filed |