NC S682 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Ch. SL 2015-109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Sunset Re: Contingent Audits
Title
Modify Sunset Re: Contingent Audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Ch. SL 2015-109 | |
2015-06-24 | Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015 | |
2015-06-18 | Pres. To Gov. 06/18/2015 | |
2015-06-17 | Ratified | |
2015-06-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H542 (Same As) 2015-04-06 - Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance