NC S675 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Community Service/Work First Program
Title
Require Community Service/Work First Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Engrossed | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-08 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |