NC S648 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Ref To Com On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-16 - Ref To Com On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Law Re: School Discipline
Title
Amend Law Re: School Discipline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2011-05-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-10 | Placed On Cal For 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-20 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Filed |