NC S617 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
LRC Study Food Allergy & Anaphylaxis Mgmt
Title
LRC Study Food Allergy & Anaphylaxis Mgmt
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Engrossed | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-19 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-04-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-14 | Filed |