NC S599 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Rendering Act Amendments
Title
Rendering Act Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Debbie Clary [R] | Sen. William Jackson [R] |
Sen. David Rouzer [R] | Sen. Richard Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-14 | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources | |
2011-04-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H512 (Same As) 2012-06-29 - Ch. SL 2012-127