NC S567 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Public Utilities
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Public Utilities
Summary
Promote Electricity Demand Reduction.
Title
Promote Electricity Demand Reduction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Public Utilities | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-05-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-12 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1484 (Same As) 2009-04-13 - Ref to the Com on Public Utilities, if favorable, Energy and Energy Efficiency
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S567 |