NC S531 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deannex: Towns of Stanfield/Badin/Red Cross
Title
Deannex: Towns of Stanfield/Badin/Red Cross
Sponsors
Sen. Wyatt Tucker [R] | Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Sen. Richard Horner [R] | Sen. Paul Newton [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 14 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2018 |
2018-06-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2018 |
2018-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2018 |
2018-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2018 |
2018-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2018 |
2018-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/18/2018 |
2018-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2018-06-13 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018 |
2018-06-13 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-13 | House | Ruled Material |
2018-06-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2018-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-06 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary I Stricken |
2017-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Judiciary I |
2017-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H305 (Same As) 2017-04-19 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV