NC S486 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Release Subdivided Lots From Tax Liens
Title
Release Subdivided Lots From Tax Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-05-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-04 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Filed |