NC S483 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-267
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-267
Summary
Clarify Judicial Creation of Trust.
Title
Clarify Judicial Creation of Trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-10 | Ch. SL 2009-267 | |
2009-07-10 | Signed By Gov. 7/10/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Ratified | |
2009-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-06-04 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-06-04 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-21 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-04-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-10 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S483 |