NC S419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Planning/Development Changes
Title
Planning/Development Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Sequential Referral To State and Local Government Stricken |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed |