NC S386 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Ch. SL 2015-206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Ch. SL 2015-206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Registers of Deeds/UCC Recording Fees
Title
Registers of Deeds/UCC Recording Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Ch. SL 2015-206 | |
2015-08-11 | Signed by Gov. 8/11/2015 | |
2015-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 08/06/2015 | |
2015-08-05 | Ratified | |
2015-08-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-08-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015 |
2015-07-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-07-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-05-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed |