NC S304 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Ch. SL 2015-239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Ch. SL 2015-239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of Logo Sign Program
Title
Administration of Logo Sign Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | Ch. SL 2015-239 | |
2015-09-10 | Signed by Gov. 9/10/2015 | |
2015-09-03 | Pres. To Gov. 09/03/2015 | |
2015-09-02 | Ratified | |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/01/2015 |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-08-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-08-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/26/2015 |
2015-08-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-08-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-08-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-08-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Transportation |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Filed |