NC S275 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement Service Purchase Rewrite Part II.-AB
Title
Retirement Service Purchase Rewrite Part II.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H160 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Ch. SL 2021-57
Subjects
Boards
Cjrs
Government Employees
Judges
Lgers
Lgers Board
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Magistrates
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
Teachers
Tsers
Tsers Board
Cjrs
Government Employees
Judges
Lgers
Lgers Board
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Magistrates
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
Teachers
Tsers
Tsers Board
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
128 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
128 | 24 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
128 | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 4.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 56 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 56.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S275 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S275v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S275v1.pdf |