NC H160 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Ch. SL 2021-57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement Service Purchase Rewrite Part II.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement Service Purchase Rewrite Part II.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28 Ch. SL 2021-57
2021-06-28 Signed by Gov. 6/28/2021
2021-06-18 Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2021
2021-06-17 Ratified
2021-06-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-06-16SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-16SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-15SenateReptd Fav
2021-06-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-06-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-20SenateRe-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-05HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-04HousePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-04HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-04-14HouseRe-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-14HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-04-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-10HouseRe-ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-10HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-01HouseRef to the Com on State Government, if favorable, State Personnel, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S275 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
S303 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
128(n/a)Citation Text
12824(n/a)Citation Text
12826(n/a)Citation Text
135(n/a)Citation Text
1354(n/a)Citation Text
13556(n/a)Citation Text
13556.2(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H160
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H160v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H160v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H160v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H160v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H160v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H160v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50181/0/H160-PCS10272-SHp-18
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50722/0/H160-PCS40433-SHp-24
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-29(CSSHp-18)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-34(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-52(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-85(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-89(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-100(sl)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-100(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H160-SMSH-100(sl)-v-4
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/159
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/283

Bill Comments

feedback