NC S246 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-09 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expand Pharmacists' Immunizing Authority
Title
Expand Pharmacists' Immunizing Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-08 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-03-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H444 (Same As) 2011-03-24 - Ref To Com On Health and Human Services