NC S212 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Ch. SL 2011-75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Ch. SL 2011-75
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cemeteries/Survey Stamp
Title
Cemeteries/Survey Stamp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Ch. SL 2011-75 | |
2011-05-12 | Signed By Gov. 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Pres. To Gov. 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Ratified | |
2011-05-10 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-21 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-07 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-03-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |