NC S20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Worker Protection Act
Title
Emergency Worker Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |