NC S130 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Ch. SL 2011-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Ch. SL 2011-73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wine Distribution Territories
Title
Wine Distribution Territories
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Ch. SL 2011-73 | |
2011-05-12 | Signed By Gov. 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Pres. To Gov. 5/5/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Ratified | |
2011-05-03 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2011-05-02 | Placed On Cal For 5/3/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-26 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-13 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2011-04-04 | Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-04-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-29 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2011-02-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |