NC S122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Ch. SL 2021-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Ch. SL 2021-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Towns of Spruce Pine & Weaverville Deannex
Title
Towns of Spruce Pine & Weaverville Deannex
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-22 - Senate - Third Reading For Concurrence (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading For Concurrence (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading For Concurrence (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | Ch. SL 2021-96 | |
2021-07-26 | Ratified | |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-07-22 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/21/2021 |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-07-15 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-07-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-07-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-07-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/13/2021 |
2021-07-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-07-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-30 | House | Ruled Material |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-24 | House | Ruled Material |
2021-06-24 | House | Serial Referral To Local Government Stricken |
2021-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-22 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Annexation
Buncombe County
Chaptered
Counties
Local
Local Government
Mitchell County
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Property
Ratified
Real Estate
Spruce Pine
Taxation
Taxes
Weaverville
Buncombe County
Chaptered
Counties
Local
Local Government
Mitchell County
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Property
Ratified
Real Estate
Spruce Pine
Taxation
Taxes
Weaverville