NC H738 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Recodification of Criminal Laws
Title
Recodification of Criminal Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Commissions
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
General Assembly
General Statutes
Membership
Minority Leader (house)
Minority Leader (senate)
President Pro Tempore
Public
Speaker
Studies
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
General Assembly
General Statutes
Membership
Minority Leader (house)
Minority Leader (senate)
President Pro Tempore
Public
Speaker
Studies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 19 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 19.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 19.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
120 | 3.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
138 | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text |